EP0248724 - Valve for a gas container or suchlike [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société dite ROVIP S.A. Chavannes CEYZERIAT (Ain) / FR | [1987/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rollet, Marius Chavannes F-01250 Ceyzeriat (Ain) / FR | [1987/50] | Representative(s) | Cabinet HERRBURGER 67 avenue Niel 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/50] | Cabinet Pierre HERRBURGER 115, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401226.3 | 02.06.1987 | [1987/50] | Priority number, date | FR19860008038 | 04.06.1986 Original published format: FR 8608038 | [1987/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0248724 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/30 | [1987/50] | CPC: |
F16K1/302 (EP,US);
F17C13/04 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0329 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0382 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32983 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/50] | Title | German: | Gasflaschenventil oder derartiges | [1987/50] | English: | Valve for a gas container or suchlike | [1987/50] | French: | Robinet de bouteille de gaz ou similaire | [1987/50] | File destroyed: | 25.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 01.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/17] | 19.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1116952 (ANCIENS ETABLISSEMENTS ETAMPAG); | [X]FR1309289 (ANCIENS ETABLISSEMENTS ETAMPAG); | [X]FR1126568 (GEORGES CLESSE SA DES ETS) |