EP0248725 - Method of rendering a hydraulic structure made of compacted concrete or filled earth water-tight [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ledeuil, Didier 20,Le Clos de l'Alizé Avenue d'Haifa F-13008 MARSEILLE / FR | [1987/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/50] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/50] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401228.9 | 02.06.1987 | [1987/50] | Priority number, date | FR19860008086 | 03.06.1986 Original published format: FR 8608086 | [1987/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0248725 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0248725 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E02B3/16, E04B1/66 | [1987/50] | CPC: |
E02B3/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Abdichten einer hydraulischen Konstruktion aus verdichtetem Beton oder aus Schüttung | [1987/50] | English: | Method of rendering a hydraulic structure made of compacted concrete or filled earth water-tight | [1987/50] | French: | Procédé pour rendre étanche à l'eau une structure hydraulique en béton compacte ou en remblais | [1987/50] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/28] | 21.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2049240 ; | [X]DE2221716 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG); | [A]DE2557292 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG); | [A]DE2734514 (WAYSS & FREYTAG AG); | [A]DE2808304 (KOEZLEKEDESI ES METRO EPITO VA, et al) |