EP0249550 - Apparatus for preforming and transferring a label in a machine for thermoforming recipients [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERCA HOLDING Zone Industrielle de Courtaboeuf Avenue du Pacifique F-91942 Les Ulis Cédex / FR | [1992/07] |
Former [1987/51] | For all designated states ERCA HOLDING, S.A.R.L. Zone Industrielle de Courtaboeuf Avenue du Pacifique F-91942 les Ulis Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hautemont, Jean-Claude 18 Domaine de Miremont F-91190 Gif-sur-Yvette / FR | [1987/51] | Representative(s) | Hasenrader, Hubert Karl, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/51] | Hasenrader, Hubert, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401286.7 | 09.06.1987 | [1987/51] | Priority number, date | FR19860008295 | 09.06.1986 Original published format: FR 8608295 | [1987/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0249550 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0249550 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/16 | [1987/51] | CPC: |
B29C51/167 (EP,US);
B29K2105/256 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/51] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Vorformen und Übertragen einer Banderole in einer Maschine zum Warmverformen von Behältern | [1987/51] | English: | Apparatus for preforming and transferring a label in a machine for thermoforming recipients | [1987/51] | French: | Dispositif de préformage et de transfert d'une banderole dans une installation de thermoformage de récipients | [1987/51] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/31] | 18.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2528355 (ERCA HOLDING [FR]); | [AD]FR2034915 (INTERCAN SA); | [A]FR2454892 (PLASTIMECANIQUE SA [FR]); | [AD]FR2528349 (ERCA HOLDING [FR]); | [A]FR2403177 (APPLIC PLASTIQUE MEC ELEC [FR]); | [A]FR2425926 (TECCA SARL [FR]); | [A]FR2340191 (GATRUN ANSTALT [LI]); | [A]FR2206168 (APPLIC PLASTIQUE MEC ELEC [FR]) |