Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] |
18.12.1991 | Change - applicant | published on 12.02.1992 [1992/07] |
30.08.1991 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.10.1991 [1991/42] |
12.05.1989 | First examination report | |
16.06.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.08.1988 [1988/31] |
31.10.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.12.1987 [1987/51] |