Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU588200B | Global Dossier | 07.09.1989 | B2 | AU7462687 | 10.12.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8608295 | 09.06.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0249550 | Global Dossier | 16.10.1991 | B1 | EP0249550 | 16.12.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8608295 | 09.06.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1290539 | 15.10.1991 | C | Priority number | Date | FR8608295 | 09.06.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3773753D1 | 21.11.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR8608295 | 09.06.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2026920T | 16.05.1992 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR8608295 | 09.06.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2599668 | 07.10.1988 | B1 | FR2599668 | 11.12.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8608295 | 09.06.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS6378731 | 08.04.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8608295 | 09.06.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4734026 | 29.03.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8608295 | 09.06.1986 |