EP0251859 - Process for the preparation of imidazopyridines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.1991 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.1991 [1991/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYNTHELABO 22, avenue Galilée 92350 Le Plessis-Robinson / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states SYNTHELABO 22, avenue Galilée F-92350 Le Plessis-Robinson / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rossey, Guy 8, Square Lebrun Voisins-le-Bretonneux F-78180 Montigny le Bretonneux / FR | 02 /
Long, David Résidence les Prés 9, Allée des Romarins F-78180 Montigny le Bretonneux / FR | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Thouret-Lemaitre, Elisabeth, et al Sanofi Département Brevets 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | Thouret-Lemaitre, Elisabeth, et al SYNTHELABO, Service Brevets, B.P. 72 F-92352 Le Plessis-Robinson Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401353.5 | 17.06.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | FR19860009330 | 27.06.1986 Original published format: FR 8609330 | [1988/14] |
Former [1988/01] | deleted | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0251859 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0251859 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0251859 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07C235/06, // (C07D471/04, 235:00, 221:00) | [1990/47] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/01] | C07D471/04, C07C103/34, // (C07D471/04, 235:00, 221:00) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Imidazopyridinen | [1988/01] | English: | Process for the preparation of imidazopyridines | [1988/01] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'imidazopyridines | [1988/01] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 08.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/05] | 17.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 04.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0022626 (ROHM & HAAS [US]); | [AD]EP0050563 (SYNTHELABO [FR]) | [X] - BULLETIN DES SOCIETES CHIMIQUES BELGES, vol. 86, no. 11, 1977, pages 879-885, Bruxelles, BE; R. VERHE et al.: "Reactions of N-1-(2,2,2-trichloroethylidene)t. butylamine with nucleophilic reagents" | [X] - CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, vol. 104, 1971, pages 3475-3485, Weinheim, DE; H. BREDERECK et al.: "Darstellung und Reaktionen substituierter Amidacetale" | [X] - CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, vol. 100, 1967, pages 2292-2295, Weinheim, DE; K. SCHANK: "Sekundäre Dialkoxy-acetamide aus Diketen" | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 91, page 606, 1979, résumé no. 55805a, Columbus, Ohio, US; M. MEYER ZUR HEYDE: "New applications of trichloroacetylisocyanate in proton NMR spectroscopy", & FRESENIUS' Z. ANAL. CHEM. 1979, 295(2-3), 125-42 |