EP0252801 - Detection device for an electromagnetic pulse, especially due to a nuclear explosion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Climent, Jean-Pierre 7, rue Max Jacob F-91100 Saint Germain Les Corbeil / FR | 02 /
Petelet, Georges Route des Landres Vendat Cidex 818 F-03110 Escurolles / FR | 03 /
Tronel, Jean-Claude 5, rue de Gascogne F-91220 Bretigny Sur Orge / FR | [1988/02] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1988/02] | Application number, filing date | 87401453.3 | 24.06.1987 | [1988/02] | Priority number, date | FR19860009294 | 26.06.1986 Original published format: FR 8609294 | [1988/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0252801 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0252801 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G21J5/00 | [1988/02] | CPC: |
G21J5/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/02] | Title | German: | Detektionsvorrichtung für einen elektromagnetischen Impuls, insbesondere hervorgerufen durch eine Kernexplosion | [1988/02] | English: | Detection device for an electromagnetic pulse, especially due to a nuclear explosion | [1988/02] | French: | Dispositif de détection d'une impulsion électromagnétique, due notamment à une explosion nucléaire | [1988/02] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 18.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/33] | 22.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 21.08.1991 | NL | 21.08.1991 | SE | 21.08.1991 | [1999/42] |
Former [1992/13] | NL | 21.08.1991 | |
SE | 21.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/12] | NL | 21.08.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3467826 (COTTERMAN ROBERT W); | [A]US3654916 (NEILSON JAMES MCEWAN MCINTYRE); | [A]FR2119973 (FRUNGEL FRANK); | [X]US4219804 (WEISCHEDEL RICHARD C [US]) |