EP0254617 - Bag or similar package with tamper-proof closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DECOMATIC S.A. B.P.49 F-38290 La Verpillière / FR | [1988/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allegre, André 62 Chemin du Bois de Serres F-69570 Dardilly / FR | [1988/04] | Representative(s) | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/04] | Bernasconi, Jean, et al Cabinet Bernasconi et Vigier 13 boulevard des Batignolles F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401520.9 | 01.07.1987 | [1988/04] | Priority number, date | FR19860010612 | 22.07.1986 Original published format: FR 8610612 | [1988/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0254617 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65D33/16 | [1988/04] | CPC: |
B65D33/1683 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1988/04] | Title | German: | Beutel oder ähnliche Verpackung mit gegen unerlaubtes Öffnen gesichertem Verschluss | [1988/04] | English: | Bag or similar package with tamper-proof closure | [1988/04] | French: | Sac ou emballage similaire à fermeture inviolable | [1988/04] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 07.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/32] | 16.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 26.06.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/01] | 01.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH466987 (VER PAPIERWARENFAB GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2235842 (ROUYRES MAURICE [FR]); | [A]FR2449607 (MONN WALTER [CH]); | [A]DE2105811 ; | [A]FR2286071 (MAZEREAU ETS [FR]) |