EP0255440 - A curable polymeric composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.03.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/05] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Yoshio 3-21, Isobe 4-chome Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Arai, Masatoshi 11-11 Isobe 4-chome Annaka-shi Gunma-ken / JP | [1988/05] | Representative(s) | Armengaud Ainé, Alain, et al Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Armengaud Ainé, Alain, et al Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1988/05] | Armengaud, Charles Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3, Avenue Bugeaud F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401759.3 | 28.07.1987 | [1988/05] | Priority number, date | JP19860179573 | 30.07.1986 Original published format: JP 17957386 | [1988/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0255440 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0255440 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/07, C08L101/02 | [1988/05] | CPC: |
C08L101/10 (EP,US);
C08K5/54 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/54, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/54, C08L83/14 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/05] | Title | German: | Härtbare Polymerzusammensetzung | [1988/05] | English: | A curable polymeric composition | [1988/05] | French: | Composition polymère durcissable | [1988/05] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 17.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 20.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1994/19] | 25.12.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4079037 (FRYE CECIL L, et al); | [Y]US4339563 (TAKAGO TOSHIO, et al); | [Y]US4323488 (TAKAGO TOSHIO, et al); | [A]US3997497 (ITOH KUNIO, et al); | [A]WO8303418 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]US4477641 (MATSUMOTO YASUJI [JP]) |