EP0260180 - Process for manufacturing a supporting and guiding frame for a device which positions an apparatus on a plane surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UP SYSTEMS 42-44 Rue des Meuniers F-93100 Montreuil / FR | [1988/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Billiote, Jean-Marie 8 place des Fédérés F-93160 Noisy Le Grand / FR | 02 /
Primat, Didier 15 chemin de Bois Caran Collonge Bellerive CH-1245 Geneve / CH | 03 /
Bouin, Thierry Résidence Le Nerprun F-28500 Boutigny / FR | 04 /
Basset, Frédéric 33 rue Frémicourt F-75015 Paris / FR | 05 /
Beauvois, Jacques 3 place des Vosges F-75004 Paris / FR | [1988/11] | Representative(s) | Tony-Durand, Serge Cabinet Tony-Durand 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | [1989/03] |
Former [1988/11] | Pinguet, André Cabinet de Proprieté Industrielle CAPRI, 94, avenue Mozart F-75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401932.6 | 26.08.1987 | [1988/11] | Priority number, date | FR19860012163 | 28.08.1986 Original published format: FR 8612163 | [1988/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0260180 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/02, B23Q1/26 | [1988/11] | CPC: |
B23Q1/26 (EP);
B23Q1/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/11] | Title | German: | Trag- und Führungsgestell eines Gerätes zum Ausrichten eines Apparats in einer flachen Ebene und Fertigungsverfahren dazu | [1988/11] | English: | Process for manufacturing a supporting and guiding frame for a device which positions an apparatus on a plane surface | [1988/11] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un bâti de support et de guidage pour un dispositif de positionnement d'un appareil dans un plan et bâti résultant | [1988/11] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 16.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/04] | 14.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/01] | 01.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.09.1988 | M02   Fee paid on   16.11.1988 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2044110 ; | [A]CH634243 ; | [A]FR2308824 ; | [A]GB287422 ; | [A]DE3415197 | [A] - SCIENCE ET VIE, no. 813, juin 1985, page 115, Paris, FR; "Le retour à l'âge de pierre" |