EP0259223 - Wooden construction panel, especially for buildings, structures and furniture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IXI ETUDE RECHERCHE DEVELOPPEMENT Tasque F-32180 Plaisance / FR | [1988/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murrate-Lesourd, Françoise 23 Rue du Vignemale F-65310 Odos / FR | 02 /
Murrate, Pierre 23 Rue du Vignemale F-65310 Odos / FR | [1988/10] | Representative(s) | Kopacz, William James Cabinet M. Sabatier 83 Avenue Foch 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | Kopacz, William James Cabinet M. SABATIER 83 avenue Foch F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1988/50] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1988/10] | Ramey, Daniel Cabinet M. SABATIER 83 avenue Foch F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87401945.8 | 28.08.1987 | [1988/10] | Priority number, date | FR19860012250 | 29.08.1986 Original published format: FR 8612250 | [1988/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0259223 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/38 | [1988/10] | CPC: |
E04B1/26 (EP);
E04C2/386 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/10] | Title | German: | Baupaneel aus Holz insbesondere für Gebaüde, Kunstbauwerke und Wohnungseinrichtungen | [1988/10] | English: | Wooden construction panel, especially for buildings, structures and furniture | [1988/10] | French: | Panneau en bois pour la construction en particulier de bâtiments, d'ouvrages d'art et de mobilier | [1988/10] | File destroyed: | 09.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 10.11.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/21] | 06.12.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2580315 ; | [Y]US4011701 ; | [A]US4590721 |