EP0260199 - Universal machine for working wood or similar material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pelloni, Jean-Paul 166 rue Danton 92000 Levallois-Perret Hauts-de-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/11] | For all designated states Pelloni, Jean-Paul 166 rue Danton F-92000 Levallois-Perret Hauts-de-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/11] | Representative(s) | Petit, Hélène Cabinet Hélène Petit 94, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/11] | Petit, Hélène Cabinet Hélène Petit 94, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87402015.9 | 09.09.1987 | [1988/11] | Priority number, date | FR19860012694 | 11.09.1986 Original published format: FR 8612694 | [1988/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0260199 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0260199 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B27C9/04 | [1988/11] | CPC: |
B27C9/04 (EP);
B27F1/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/11] | Title | German: | Universalmaschine zur Bearbeitung von Holz oder ähnlichem Werkstoff | [1988/11] | English: | Universal machine for working wood or similar material | [1988/11] | French: | Machine universelle pour le travail du bois ou d'un matériau analogue | [1988/11] | Examination procedure | 24.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/44] | 06.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.10.1990 | GB | 31.10.1990 | IT | 31.10.1990 | NL | 31.10.1990 | SE | 31.10.1990 | ES | 11.02.1991 | [2004/03] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 31.10.1990 | |
GB | 31.10.1990 | ||
IT | 31.10.1990 | ||
NL | 31.10.1990 | ||
SE | 31.10.1990 | ||
Former [1991/52] | AT | 31.10.1990 | |
GB | 31.10.1990 | ||
NL | 31.10.1990 | ||
SE | 31.10.1990 | ||
Former [1991/44] | AT | 31.10.1990 | |
NL | 31.10.1990 | ||
SE | 31.10.1990 | ||
Former [1991/42] | AT | 31.10.1990 | |
SE | 31.10.1990 | ||
Former [1991/27] | SE | 31.10.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR676778 ; | [A]US1784644 (EUGENE TEUTSCH); | [A]US2085235 (TAUTZ HERBERT E); | [A]US3011533 (NEWMAN SR HERBERT A); | [A]US3734151 (SKRIPSKY H); | [A]US4292870 (MERICLE JOHN E); | [A]US4335765 (MURPHY RHOLAND D); | [A]GB2122526 (TEKRON LICENSING BV); | [A]FR2533491 (UZINA CONSTRUCTII REPARATII UT [RO]) |