Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.1993 [1993/13] |
21.02.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.04.1992 [1992/15] |
23.11.1990 | First examination report | |
17.03.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.05.1989 [1989/18] |
02.01.1989 | Publication of search report | published on 22.02.1989 [1989/08] |
21.11.1988 | Change - classification | published on 11.01.1989 [1989/02] |
24.02.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.04.1988 [1988/15] |