EP0263746 - System for reading identification cards with electrical contacts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.1993 [1993/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCELCO, SOCIETE ANONYME 29, rue des Bas Rogers 92150 Suresnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/15] | For all designated states FRANCELCO, SOCIETE ANONYME 29, rue des Bas Rogers F-92150 Suresnes / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rozet, Dominique 10 Rue Ferdinand Dreyfus F-78120 Rambouillet / FR | [1988/15] | Representative(s) | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/15] | Fort, Jacques, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87402179.3 | 30.09.1987 | [1988/15] | Priority number, date | FR19860013760 | 02.10.1986 Original published format: FR 8613760 | [1988/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0263746 | Date: | 13.04.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0263746 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0263746 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/06, G06K19/067 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
G06K13/0893 (EP);
G06K19/07743 (EP);
G06K7/0047 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1989/02] | G06K7/06, G06K19/06 | ||
Former IPC [1988/15] | G06K7/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1988/15] | Title | German: | System zum Abtasten von Identifikationskarten mit elektrischen Kontakten | [1988/15] | English: | System for reading identification cards with electrical contacts | [1988/15] | French: | Système à lecture de cartes d'identification à contacts électriques | [1988/15] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/18] | 28.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60153583 ; | [A]JP60173789 ; | [A]DE3343727 ; | [A]DE3235654 ; | [A]WO7900543 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 329 (P-416) [2052], 24 décembre 1985; & JP-A-60 153 583 (MITSUBISHI JUSHI K.K.) 13.08.1985, & JP60153583 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 22 (P-424) [2079], 28 janvier 1986; & JP-A-60 173 789 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) 07.09.1985, & JP60173789 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0189039 |