Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.1991 [1991/03] |
23.12.1989 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.02.1990 [1990/06] |
19.12.1989 | Change - representative | published on 07.02.1990 [1990/06] |
15.11.1989 | Change - representative | published on 03.01.1990 [1990/01] |
22.09.1989 | Change - representative | published on 08.11.1989 [1989/45] |
18.11.1988 | First examination report | |
16.04.1988 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.06.1988 [1988/22] |
16.04.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.06.1988 [1988/22] |