EP0269473 - Dogging of a door locking hook in its locking position [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.1991 [1991/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRAILOR S.A. 3 route nationale 10 "Le Gibet" Coignières 78311 Maurepas Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states TRAILOR S.A. 3 route nationale 10 "Le Gibet" Coignières F-78311 Maurepas Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mikula, Vincent Antoine 91 rue Ernest Bichat F-54300 Luneville / FR | 02 /
Mikula, Jean Stanislas 16, Quai de l'Ile Saint-André F-54300 Luneville / FR | 03 /
Guimont, Gérard Marie René 7, rue Louis Ferry F-54300 Luneville / FR | 04 /
Daniel, Philippe 15, rue de la Louvière Xermamenil F-54300 Luneville / FR | 05 /
Poncelin de Raucourt, Olivier Marie Joseph 39, rue du Rempart F-54300 Luneville / FR | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novapat France 63bis Boulevard Bessières 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT FRANCE 63 bis, boulevard Bessières F-75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1990/01] | Kügele, Bernhard NOVAPAT FRANCE 63 bis, boulevard Bessières F-75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1989/45] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1988/22] | Barnay, André François Cabinet Barnay 72, rue d'Hauteville B.P. 171 F-75463 Paris Cédex 10 / FR | Application number, filing date | 87402296.5 | 14.10.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | FR19860015999 | 18.11.1986 Original published format: FR 8615999 | [1988/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0269473 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0269473 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/16, E05B63/20, E05B63/24 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
E05B63/20 (EP);
E05B63/24 (EP);
E05B83/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1988/22] | Title | German: | Verriegelung eines Riegels in der verriegelten Stellung | [1988/22] | English: | Dogging of a door locking hook in its locking position | [1988/22] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage en position d'accrochage d'un crochet de fermeture de porte | [1988/22] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/22] | 21.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2410023 ; | [A]FR444854 |