EP0267844 - Apparatus for the continuous stripping of plastic films on a board, especially a printed circuit one [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.1990 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.1990 [1990/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Limon, Claude 12 Allée des Eiders F-75008 Paris / FR | For all designated states Delcampe, Pierre 44, Avenue Montesquieu F-93190 Livry-Gargan / FR | [1988/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/20] | Representative(s) | Armengaud Ainé, Alain Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/20] | Armengaud Ainé, Alain Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87402427.6 | 27.10.1987 | [1988/20] | Priority number, date | FR19860015851 | 14.11.1986 Original published format: FR 8615851 | [1988/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0267844 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0267844 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B26F3/00, H05K3/00, B65H41/00 | [1988/20] | CPC: |
B29C63/0013 (EP);
B26F3/00 (EP);
B65H41/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/20] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum kontinuierlichen Entfernen von Kunststoff-Folien auf Platten, insbesondere Leiterplatten | [1988/20] | English: | Apparatus for the continuous stripping of plastic films on a board, especially a printed circuit one | [1988/20] | French: | Dispositif pour enlever en continu et au défilé des films plastiques sur une plaque, notamment une plaque de circuit imprimé | [1988/20] | File destroyed: | 29.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.03.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/45] | 18.06.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.04.1990 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2751862 ; | [A]US3452980 ; | [AP]EP0218873 |