EP0269493 - Method and device for controlling the roll alignment of a continuous-casting installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.1989 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLECIM 107 boulevard de la Mission Marchand F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1988/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barbe, Jacques 23 rue Docteur Charcot F-42100 Saint-Etienne / FR | 02 /
Damoizet, René 27 rue d'Artois F-42400 Saint-Chamond / FR | 03 /
Sapin, Pierre 16 Avenue des Alpes F-42650 St Jean Bonnefonds / FR | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Le Brusque, Maurice, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | Le Brusque, Maurice, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phélip 21, rue de la Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87402446.6 | 29.10.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | FR19860015161 | 30.10.1986 Original published format: FR 8615161 | [1988/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0269493 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/16 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
B22D11/208 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1988/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überwachung der Ausrichtung von Rollen einer Stranggiessanlage | [1988/22] | English: | Method and device for controlling the roll alignment of a continuous-casting installation | [1988/22] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de contrôle de l'alignement des rouleaux d'une installation de coulée continue | [1988/22] | File destroyed: | 15.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 02.12.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/44] | 07.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2645022 ; | [A]FR2232380 ; | [AD]FR2375935 ; | [A]EP0047919 ; | [A]EP0014862 ; | [A]JPS57134244 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 236 (M-173)[1114]25 novembre 1982; & JP-A-57 134 244 (HITACHI ZOSEN K.K.) 19-08-1982 |