EP0235058 - Cutting-off support for a portable electric grinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROUX, Pierre 34, rue Garibaldi F-69006 Lyon / FR | [1987/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/36] | Representative(s) | Schmitt, John Cabinet John Schmitt 9, rue Pizay 69001 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | Schmitt, John Cabinet John Schmitt 9, rue Pizay F-69001 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 87420044.7 | 13.02.1987 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | FR19860002354 | 18.02.1986 Original published format: FR 8602354 | [1987/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0235058 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0235058 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B24B27/08 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
B23D59/007 (EP);
B23D45/042 (EP);
B23D59/002 (EP);
B24B27/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/36] | Title | German: | Trennhalterung für elektrische Handschleifmaschine | [1987/36] | English: | Cutting-off support for a portable electric grinder | [1987/36] | French: | Support de tronçonnage pour meuleuse électrique portative | [1987/36] | Examination procedure | 27.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/14] | 10.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 06.12.1989 | GR | 06.12.1989 | SE | 06.12.1989 | CH | 28.02.1990 | LI | 28.02.1990 | LU | 28.02.1990 | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/52] | GB | 06.12.1989 | |
SE | 06.12.1989 | ||
CH | 28.02.1990 | ||
LI | 28.02.1990 | ||
LU | 28.02.1990 | ||
Former [1991/09] | GB | 06.12.1989 | |
SE | 06.12.1989 | ||
CH | 28.02.1990 | ||
LI | 28.02.1990 | ||
Former [1990/42] | GB | 06.12.1989 | |
SE | 06.12.1989 | ||
Former [1990/34] | SE | 06.12.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009859 (ROBINSON HARRY G); | [Y]US2707853 (CARROLL RAYMOND B); | [A]DE2456443 (HUZEL KARL); | [Y]DE2510839 (STOCKERT MASCH HANDEL); | [A]DE3216935 (HUZEL KARL) |