EP0266278 - Method and apparatus for the determination of immunologically reactive substances of clinical interest [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.12.1993 [1993/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDICIA DIAGNOSTICS 33 avenue de Californie F-69300 Oullins / FR | [1993/19] |
Former [1988/18] | For all designated states INDICIA Société Civile d'Etudes et de Recherches (S.C.E.R.) 87 rue de la République F-69600 Oullins / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Serres, Pierre-François 4, rue Etienne Radix F-69630 Chaponost / FR | [1988/18] | Representative(s) | Nony, Michel, et al NONY & ASSOCIES 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | Nony, Michel, et al NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1991/38] | Ropital-Bonvarlet, Claude Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51 Avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 7073 F-69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1989/20] | Ropital-Bonvarlet, Claude Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE 51, avenue Jean-Jaurès B.P. 7073 F-69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1988/18] | Gauckler, Jacques HOSPAL C.O.T. SCE Brevets B.P. 21 13, Avenue de Lattre de Tassigny F-69881 Meyzieu Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 87420249.2 | 24.09.1987 | [1988/18] | Priority number, date | FR19860013782 | 30.09.1986 Original published format: FR 8613782 | [1988/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0266278 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0266278 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/546, G01N33/53, B01F11/00 | [1988/18] | CPC: |
G01N33/54313 (EP,US);
Y10S436/805 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zur Bestimmung von immunologischen reaktiven Substanzen von klinischem Interesse | [1988/18] | English: | Method and apparatus for the determination of immunologically reactive substances of clinical interest | [1988/18] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de dosage de substances d'intérêt clinique réactives immunologiquement | [1988/18] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/52: Teilanmeldung 91101049.4 eingereicht am 24/09/87 | EPB 1992/52: Divisional application 91101049.4 filed on 24/09/87 | EPB 1992/52: Demande divisionnaire 91101049.4 déposée le 24/09/87 | Examination procedure | 09.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/28] | 23.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/32] | 27.02.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/32] | 17.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP91101049.4 / EP0435851 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/50] | Request for further processing for: | 17.08.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.11.1992 | Decision despatched | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 17.08.1992 | Date of receipt | 06.11.1992 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 23.12.1992 | [1993/28] | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0005978 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]); | [Y]EP0106122 (MILES LAB [US]); | [YD]EP0163312 (DAIICHI PURE CHEMICALS CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0174195 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [YD]EP0186946 (VIRAL ANTIGENS INC [US]); | [YD]EP0189389 (INST INT PATHOLOGIE CELLULAIRE [BE]); | [Y]GB2136565 (BOOTS CELLTECH DIAGNOSTICS); | [YD]US3488156 (GOOD DOROTHY I, et al); | [Y]US4239746 (BARTOS DEZSO I [DE], et al); | [Y]US4250394 (O'CONNOR JOHN J [US]); | [Y]US4203724 (ENOMOTO SHOGO [JP], et al); | [Y]FR1409780 (PASTEUR INSTITUT); | [Y]FR1596064 ; | [A]EP0094216 (CENTOCOR INC [US]); | [A]GB2040441 (AKRO MEDIC ENG INC) |