EP0269533 - Anchoring clamp for an insulated electrical conductor equipped with a likewise insulated supporting cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MALICO Z.I. de Mayencin Rue des Essarts F-38610 Gieres / FR | [1988/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lienart, Jean-Pierre Saint Martin d'Uriage F-38410 Uriage / FR | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Pierre, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU B.P. 3011 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | [1988/22] | Application number, filing date | 87420302.9 | 04.11.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | FR19860016027 | 06.11.1986 Original published format: FR 8616027 | [1988/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0269533 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0269533 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/24, H02G7/05 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
H02G7/056 (EP,US);
G02B6/48 (EP,US);
H01R4/2491 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3969 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3996 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/22] | Title | German: | Abspannklemme für einen isolierten elektrischen Leiter mit einem ebenfalls isolierten Tragseil | [1988/22] | English: | Anchoring clamp for an insulated electrical conductor equipped with a likewise insulated supporting cable | [1988/22] | French: | Pince d'ancrage pour conducteur électrique isolé équipé d'un câble porteur également isolé | [1988/22] | Examination procedure | 14.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/11] | 17.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.12.1988 | M02   Fee paid on   14.01.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 17.07.1991 | AT | 04.11.1991 | SE | 05.11.1991 | CH | 30.11.1991 | LI | 30.11.1991 | LU | 30.11.1991 | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 04.11.1991 | |
SE | 05.11.1991 | ||
CH | 30.11.1991 | ||
LI | 30.11.1991 | ||
LU | 30.11.1991 | ||
Former [1993/15] | AT | 04.11.1991 | |
SE | 05.11.1991 | ||
CH | 30.11.1991 | ||
LI | 30.11.1991 | ||
Former [1992/41] | SE | 05.11.1991 | |
CH | 30.11.1991 | ||
LI | 30.11.1991 | ||
Former [1992/32] | SE | 05.11.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2379925 (DERVAUX ETS [FR]); | [A]FR2436509 (GORO) |