EP0274968 - Polymers containing imide groups prepared from sterically hindered diamines, and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barthelemy, Pascal 21, rue de la Part-Dieu F-69003 Lyon / FR | [1988/29] | Representative(s) | Trolliet, Maurice, et al RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Serviice Brevets Chimie Centre de Recherches de Saint-Fons B.P. 62 69192 Saint-Fons Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Trolliet, Maurice, et al RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Serviice Brevets Chimie Centre de Recherches de Saint-Fons B.P. 62 69192 Saint-Fons Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1988/29] | Trolliet, Maurice, et al RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Service Brevets Chimie Centre de Recherches des Carrières B.P. 62 F-69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 87420334.2 | 14.12.1987 | [1988/29] | Priority number, date | FR19860017918 | 17.12.1986 Original published format: FR 8617918 | [1988/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0274968 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0274968 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0274968 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08F222/40, C08G73/12, C08F216/14 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
C08G73/122 (EP);
C08G73/10 (KR);
C08F216/1458 (EP);
C08F222/40 (EP,KR);
C08G73/121 (EP);
C08G73/125 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/29] | Title | German: | Polyimide aus sterisch gehinderten Diaminen und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1988/29] | English: | Polymers containing imide groups prepared from sterically hindered diamines, and process for their preparation | [1988/29] | French: | Polymères à groupements imides faits à partir de diamines encombrées et leurs procédés de préparation | [1988/29] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/07] | 12.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2094607 (RHONE POULENC SA) | Examination | EP0122149 |