EP0248751 - Device for automatically centering a product beneath a cutter head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etablissements Guy RIONDE La Samaritaine 88800 Vittel / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/50] | For all designated states Etablissements Guy RIONDE La Samaritaine F-88800 Vittel / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rionde, Guy 3, rue des Aubépines F-88800 Vittel / FR | [1987/50] | Representative(s) | Metz, Paul Cabinet Metz Patni 1a Place Boecler B.P. 10063 67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Metz, Paul Cabinet Metz Patni 1a Place Boecler B.P. 10063 67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [1987/50] | Metz, Paul CABINET METZ PATNI 63, rue de la Ganzau B.P. 63 F-67024 Strasbourg Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 87440033.6 | 05.06.1987 | [1987/50] | Priority number, date | FR19860008326 | 06.06.1986 Original published format: FR 8608326 | [1987/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0248751 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0248751 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/01, B23Q3/18 | [1987/50] | CPC: |
B23Q3/183 (EP);
B26D7/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/50] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum automatischen Zentrieren eines Produktes unter einem Schneidkopf | [1987/50] | English: | Device for automatically centering a product beneath a cutter head | [1987/50] | French: | Ensemble de centrage automatique d'un produit sous une tête de découpe | [1987/50] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 06.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/32] | 22.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/51] | Request for further processing for: | 12.04.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.05.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 27.12.1990 | [2002/23] |
Former [1992/16] | CH | 30.06.1991 | |
LI | 30.06.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6030539 ; | [A]DE484595 (JEAN CREMER, et al); | [A]US1800706 (TURNQUIST CARL E); | [A]US2901085 (MCCOY THOMAS A); | [A]FR2228583 (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | [A]DE2626206 (KRUPP GMBH) | [A] - VOEDING EN TECHNIEK, vol. 1, no. 27, 1 novembre 1967, pages 687-688, Zeist, NL; "Kaasdeelmachine, een interessante Nederlandse ontwikkeling" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 155 (M-392)[1878], 29 juin 1985; & JP-A-60 30 539 (AMADA K.K.) 16-02-1985, & JP6030539 A 00000000 |