EP0266294 - Theft-proof device for hanging up clothes or similar items, and leather-goods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.1991 [1991/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allegranza, René 4, Impasse du Colonel MARCAIRE F-21240 TALANT / FR | [1988/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/18] | Representative(s) | Bruder, Michel Cabinet Guiu & Bruder 68, rue d'Hauteville 75010 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/10] | Bruder, Michel Cabinet Bruder 46 Rue Decamps F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87470017.2 | 31.08.1987 | [1988/18] | Priority number, date | FR19860013664 | 29.09.1986 Original published format: FR 8613664 | [1988/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0266294 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E05B69/00 | [1988/18] | CPC: |
E05B69/00 (EP);
E05B73/0017 (EP);
E05B73/0035 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/18] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsvorrichtung zum Festhängen von Kleidungsstücken und dergleichen sowie Lederwaren | [1988/18] | English: | Theft-proof device for hanging up clothes or similar items, and leather-goods | [1988/18] | French: | Dispositif antivol pour articles du type vestimentaires textiles divers, et maroquinerie | [1988/18] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 20.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/51] | 21.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/09] | 17.09.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3125 |