EP0251976 - Shear force gauge and method and apparatus for limiting embolectomy shear force [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fogarty, Thomas J. 3270 Alpine Road Portola Valley California 94028 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states Fogarty, Thomas J. 3270 Alpine Road Portola Valley, California 94028 / US | ||
Former [1988/01] | For all designated states FOGARTY, Thomas J. 770 Welch Road Suite 201 Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chin, Albert K. 340 Alexander Avenue Redwood City California 94061 / US | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 87630062.5 | 07.04.1987 | [1988/01] | Priority number, date | US19860872048 | 05.06.1986 Original published format: US 872048 | [1988/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0251976 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0251976 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0251976 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/02, G01L5/06, A61M25/00 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
A61B17/3207 (EP,US);
A61B90/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/01] | Title | German: | Scherkraftmesser, Verfahren und Gerät zur Begrenzung der Scherkraft während einer Embolectomie | [1988/01] | English: | Shear force gauge and method and apparatus for limiting embolectomy shear force | [1988/01] | French: | Jauge de contrainte au cisaillement, méthode et appareil pour limiter la force de cisaillement au cours d'une embolectomie | [1988/01] | Examination procedure | 20.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/34] | 12.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR466514 [ ] (AUGUSTE ANGELY [FR]); | US3557794 [ ] (PATTEN ROBERT E VAN); | US4655749 [ ] (FISCHIONE EUGENE A [US]) |