EP0258171 - Composite article and method and apparatus for producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPERIN TECHNICAL PTY.LTD P.O. Box 432 Malvern Victoria 3144 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states ALPERIN TECHNICAL PTY.LTD P.O. Box 432 Malvern Victoria 3144 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alperin, Jorge 3/35 Tintern Avenue Toorak Victoria 3142 / AU | [1988/09] | Representative(s) | Bleyer, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | Bleyer, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 87630154.0 | 28.08.1987 | [1988/09] | Priority number, date | AU19860007778 | 29.08.1986 Original published format: AU 777886 | [1988/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0258171 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0258171 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B28B1/52, B28B13/02, B28B3/02, B28B1/08 | [1988/09] | CPC: |
B28B7/44 (EP);
B28B1/0873 (EP);
B28B1/52 (EP);
B28B13/0215 (EP);
B28B3/022 (EP);
C04B40/0028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/09] | Title | German: | Verbundelement, Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu dessen Herstellung | [1988/09] | English: | Composite article and method and apparatus for producing same | [1988/09] | French: | Elément composite, méthode et dispositif pour sa fabrication | [1988/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 06.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/12] | 21.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.08.1990 | M01   Fee paid on   27.08.1990 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.09.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE235034 ; | [Y]GB191027147 (NORTON CHARLES LADD [US]); | [Y]GB191220485 (STEELE HENRY ROBERT); | [Y]FR1461690 ; | [A]DE1557214 (SCHLECHT DIPL ING KARL); | [A]FR2186878 (SERCI [FR]); | [A]FR2230477 (ONODA CEMENT CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]US4094941 (MANNERS STANLEY H, et al); | [A]GB2004807 (GILLESPIE D L); | [Y]GB2022503 (UNITED STATES GYPSUM CO); | [A]DE3307341 (ZUEBLIN AG [DE]); | [A]WO8601767 (VIGNOLLES JEAN) |