EP0261062 - Modified ceramic structures and methods of making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXIDE TECHNOLOGY COMPANY, LP. Tralee Industrial Park Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | For all designated states LANXIDE TECHNOLOGY COMPANY, LP. Tralee Industrial Park Newark Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dwivedi, Ratnesh K. 2628 Bellows Road Wilmington Delaware 19810 / US | 02 /
Kennedy, Christopher R. 17 Welwyn Road Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [1988/12] | Representative(s) | Andrae, Steffen, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Andrae, Steffen, et al Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/16] | Andrae, Steffen, Dr., et al DENNEMEYER & ASSOCIATES Balanstrasse 55 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/12] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 87630182.1 | 10.09.1987 | [1988/12] | Priority number, date | US19860908458 | 17.09.1986 Original published format: US 908458 | [1988/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0261062 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0261062 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/65, C04B41/87 | [1988/12] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B35/00 (KR);
C04B35/652 (EP,US);
C04B41/5025 (EP,US);
C04B41/87 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/00 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/65 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B38/00 (US,EP);
C04B41/5025, C04B41/4505 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/12] | Title | German: | Modifizierte keramische Strukturen und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1988/12] | English: | Modified ceramic structures and methods of making the same | [1988/12] | French: | Structures céramiques modifiées et méthodes de leur production | [1988/12] | Examination procedure | 09.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/45] | 16.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.04.1992 | CH | 22.04.1992 | GR | 22.04.1992 | LI | 22.04.1992 | SE | 22.04.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1993/03] | AT | 22.04.1992 | |
CH | 22.04.1992 | ||
LI | 22.04.1992 | ||
SE | 22.04.1992 | ||
Former [1992/47] | CH | 22.04.1992 | |
LI | 22.04.1992 | ||
SE | 22.04.1992 | ||
Former [1992/41] | CH | 22.04.1992 | |
LI | 22.04.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | EP0155831 [ ] (LANXIDE CORP [US]); | EP0169067 [ ] (LANXIDE CORP [US]); | EP0193292 [ ] (LANXIDE CORP [US]) |