EP0311726 - Cryogenic cooler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.1991 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICE CRYOGENIC ENGINEERING LTD. 22 Yavne Street Tel Aviv / IL | [1989/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kushnir, Mark 43/5 Levin Epstein Street Rehovot / IL | 02 /
Unger, Reuven Z. 9 Hacharuv Street Kfar-Vradim / IL | [1989/16] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 87630229.0 | 05.11.1987 | [1989/16] | Priority number, date | US19870098020 | 17.09.1987 Original published format: US 98020 | [1989/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0311726 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0311726 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F25B9/00, F04B39/04, F02G1/043 | [1989/16] | CPC: |
F25B9/14 (EP,US);
F02G1/0445 (EP,US);
F02G2244/00 (EP,US);
F02G2244/10 (EP,US);
F02G2250/18 (EP,US);
F02G2258/10 (EP,US);
F25B2309/003 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/16] | Title | German: | Tiefsttemperaturkälteanlage | [1989/16] | English: | Cryogenic cooler | [1989/16] | French: | Réfrigérateur cryogénique | [1989/16] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.07.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/14] | 06.11.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.08.1990 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3889119 (WHICKER STEPHEN L, et al); | [Y]US4365982 (DURENEC PETER); | [X]US4550571 (BERTSCH PETER K [US]); | [Y]US4558570 (SHTRIKMAN SHMUEL [IL], et al) |