EP0249573 - Method and apparatus for the slag-free emptying of ladles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 40027 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/51] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 D-40027 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kornet, Manfred Feldmannstrasse 28a D-4130 Moers 3 / DE | 02 /
Franzen, Hans Uwe Grossenbaumer Allee 120 D-4100 Duisburg 29 / DE | 03 /
Glaser, Josef Angerbenden 27 D-4000 Düsseldorf 31 / DE | [1987/51] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Hohenzollerndamm 89 14199 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1987/51] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro, et al Hohenzollerndamm 89 D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 87730019.4 | 23.02.1987 | [1987/51] | Priority number, date | DE19863619416 | 10.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3619416 | [1987/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0249573 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0249573 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/18, B22D37/00, B22D2/00 | [1989/23] | CPC: |
B22D11/183 (EP,US);
B22D37/00 (EP,US);
B22D41/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/51] | B22D11/16, B22D41/08, B22D2/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, LU, NL [1987/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zum schlackenfreien Entleeren einer Giesspfanne | [1987/51] | English: | Method and apparatus for the slag-free emptying of ladles | [1987/51] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour laisser couler d'une poche de coulée un métal liquide exempt de scories | [1987/51] | File destroyed: | 02.10.1996 | Examination procedure | 03.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/05] | 15.06.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58221643 ; | [A]JPS5758971 ; | [AD]DE2814699 (MANNESMANN AG); | [A]EP0172394 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 76, 9. April 1984Seite 67 M 288; & JP-A-58 221 643 (SHIN NIPPON SEITETSU K.K.) 23-12-1983 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 134 (M-144)[1012]24. Juli 1982; & JP-A-57 058 971 (KAWASAKI SEITETSU K.K.) 09-04-1982 |