EP0241411 - Anti-skid device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RUD-Kettenfabrik Rieger & Dietz GmbH u. Co. Postfach 16 50 73406 Aalen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states RUD-Kettenfabrik Rieger & Dietz GmbH u. Co. Postfach 16 50 D-73406 Aalen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biehler, Wolfgang Kernerstrasse 8 D-7080 Aalen / DE | [1987/42] | Representative(s) | Böning, Manfred, et al Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | Böning, Manfred, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Dieter Jander Dr.-Ing. Manfred Böning Leistikowstrasse 2 D-14050 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 87730033.5 | 03.04.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | DE19863611836 | 05.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3611836 | [1987/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0241411 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0241411 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241411 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/10] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0241411 | Date: | 30.07.1991 | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60B39/00 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
B60B39/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI, SE [1987/42] | Title | German: | Gleitschutzvorrichtung | [1987/42] | English: | Anti-skid device | [1987/42] | French: | Dispositif antidérapant | [1987/42] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 06.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB190823817 (TOMLINS ALFRED [GB], et al); | [Y]US1403270 (SMALL DAVID P); | [X]US2264466 (WEISEL CARLETON A); | [Y]US2442322 (DALEY FRANK J); | [X]US2815828 (SCHAEFER JOHN H) |