EP0256968 - Automatic process for the contactless three-dimensional measurement of objects with large dimensions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 40027 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/08] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 D-40027 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deppe, Gerd-Joachim, Dr. Dipl. Phys. Eibendonk 24 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Fister, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Konrad-Adenauer-Ring 89 D-4040 Neuss / DE | 03 /
Schönartz, Dipl. Phys. Dr. Butzbacher Weg 14 D-4000 Düsseldorf / DE | [1988/08] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1988/08] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro, et al Postfach D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 87730044.2 | 21.04.1987 | [1988/08] | Priority number, date | DE19863624959 | 23.07.1986 Original published format: DE 3624959 | [1988/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0256968 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/24, G01B11/00 | [1988/08] | CPC: |
G01B11/2441 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/08] | Title | German: | Automatisches Verfahren zur berührungslosen dreidimensionalen Vermessung von Objekten grosser Ausdehnung | [1988/08] | English: | Automatic process for the contactless three-dimensional measurement of objects with large dimensions | [1988/08] | French: | Procédé automatique de mesure sans contact en trois dimensions d'objets de grande extension | [1988/08] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 10.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/40] | 08.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/22] | 28.12.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2517052 [ ] (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]); | EP0140972 [ ] (SHIMIZU NAOKI); | EP0134597 [ ] (OPTISCHE IND DE OUDE DELFT NV [NL]) |