EP0275816 - Process for the treatment of finely divided steel waste material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.1993 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 40027 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 D-40027 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Hagen, Ingo, Dr. Ing. Schumanstrasse 1 D-4150 Krefeld 11 / DE | 02 /
Kulgemeyer, Axel, Dr.-Ing. Kesenhofweg 9 D-4150 Krefeld 11 / DE | 03 /
Pillmayer, Klaus Solinger Strasse 51 D-5630 Remscheid / DE | [1988/30] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1988/30] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro, et al Postfach D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 87730164.8 | 11.12.1987 | [1988/30] | Priority number, date | DE19863644348 | 19.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3644348 | [1988/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0275816 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0275816 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C22B1/248 | [1988/30] | CPC: |
C22B1/248 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [1988/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Aufbereitung von feinteiligen Stahlabfällen | [1988/30] | English: | Process for the treatment of finely divided steel waste material | [1988/30] | French: | Procédé pour le traitement des déchets d'acier finement divisés | [1988/30] | Examination procedure | 10.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/40] | 06.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE346068 ; | [A]DE1119886 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG); | [Y]US3414408 (EICHENBERGER WALTER W); | [YD]DE2151819 (HUTT GMBH); | [A]US4260373 (FELLNOR JOHN R, et al) |