EP0236259 - Device for the treatment of micro-organisms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.1992 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tschudin & Heid AG Haupstrasse 35 CH-4437 Waldenburg / CH | [1987/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baerfuss, Achilles Sonnenweg 5 CH-4104 Oberwil / CH | [1987/37] | Representative(s) | Eder, Carl E., et al Braunpat Braun Eder AG Patent - Marken - Rechtsanwälte Reussstrasse 22 Postfach 4015 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | Eder, Carl E., et al Patentanwaltsbüro EDER AG Lindenhofstrasse 40 CH-4052 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 87810004.9 | 06.01.1987 | [1987/37] | Priority number, date | CH19860000904 | 05.03.1986 Original published format: CH 90486 | [1987/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0236259 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0236259 | Date: | 10.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/06, C12M1/08 | [1987/37] | CPC: |
C12M27/02 (EP);
C12M23/34 (EP);
C12M27/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/37] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Behandeln von Mikroorganismen | [1987/37] | English: | Device for the treatment of micro-organisms | [1987/37] | French: | Dispositif de traitement des micro-organismes | [1987/37] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/19] | 24.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/29] | 12.02.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2441427 ; | [Y]CH573768 ; | [A]US3635796 ; | [A]GB2054646 |