EP0237486 - Cooling element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colenco AG Parkstrasse 27 CH-5400 Baden / CH | [1987/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paulovic, Michal Naglerwiesenstrasse 54 CH-8049 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Yadigaroglu, George, Prof. Dr. Hinterbergstrasse 83 CH-8044 Zürich / CH | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Fillinger, Peter Dr. P. Fillinger Patentanwalt AG, Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Fillinger, Peter, Dr. Rütistrasse 1a CH-5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 87810124.5 | 04.03.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | CH19860000957 | 08.03.1986 Original published format: CH 95786 | [1987/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0237486 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0237486 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F28C1/14, F28C1/06, F28F25/12, F01K9/02 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
F28C1/14 (EP);
F28C2001/145 (EP);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/38] | Title | German: | Kühlelement | [1987/38] | English: | Cooling element | [1987/38] | French: | Elément de refroidissement | [1987/38] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/07] | 04.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.05.1989 | IT | 24.05.1989 | NL | 24.05.1989 | ES | 04.09.1989 | [2004/03] |
Former [2002/24] | FR | 24.05.1989 | |
IT | 24.05.1989 | ||
NL | 24.05.1989 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 24.05.1989 | |
NL | 24.05.1989 | ||
Former [1990/11] | NL | 24.05.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB571292 (CLIMATOR LTD, et al); | [A]FR2289871 (GEA LUFTKUEHLER HAPPEL GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4076771 (HOUX JR JAMES R, et al); | [A]FR2388235 (LUMMUS CO [US]); | [A]GB1559330 (MARLEY CO); | [A]EP0017517 (HAMON SOBELCO SA [BE]); | [A]DE3135783 (BRETTING EKKEHARD DIPL ING) |