EP0241422 - Mobile chain saw for working concrete, stone and masonry work [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gamma Stawag AG Glattalstrasse 525 CH-8153 Rümlang / CH | [1987/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boller Willi Luckhausenstrasse 13 CH-8308 Agasul-Illnau / CH | [1987/42] | Representative(s) | Bruderer, Werner Patentanwaltskanzlei Oberhittnauerstrasse 12 8330 Pfäffikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | Bruderer, Werner Patentanwaltskanzlei Oberhittnauerstrasse 12 CH-8330 Pfäffikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 87810195.5 | 01.04.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | CH19860001329 | 05.04.1986 Original published format: CH 132986 | [1987/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0241422 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241422 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B28D1/08 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
B28D1/084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/42] | Title | German: | Mobile Kettensäge für die Bearbeitung von Beton, Gesteinen und Mauerwerk | [1987/42] | English: | Mobile chain saw for working concrete, stone and masonry work | [1987/42] | French: | Scie à chaîne mobile pour travailler du béton, de la pierre et de la maçonnerie | [1987/42] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/03] | 14.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1676428 (DAVIS CHARLES E); | [A]CH387922 (BERGBORRMASKINER AB [SE]); | [AD]DE2207065 ; | [A]DE2228691 ; | [A]DE2300737 (CONTINENTAL DRILLING CO) |