EP0241425 - Power control with overload protection for a drilling tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft FL-9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Millauer, Wolfgang Dietrich-Stein-Strasse 5 D-8000 München 60 / DE | 02 /
Hoyss, Franz Georg-Schwaighofer-Strasse 7 D-8170 Wackersberg / DE | 03 /
Pauli, Heinrich Holzbachstrasse 7 D-8034 Germering / DE | 04 /
Benz, Gottfried Bahnstrasse 7 FL-9494 Schaan / LI | [1987/42] | Representative(s) | Wildi, Roland Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | Wildi, Roland Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung FL-9494 Schaan / LI | Application number, filing date | 87810201.1 | 03.04.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | DE19863612193 | 11.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3612193 | [1987/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0241425 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B23B45/02, H02P7/638 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
B23B45/02 (EP,US);
B23Q11/04 (EP,US);
H02P25/14 (EP,US);
B23B2260/128 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1987/42] | Title | German: | Antriebsregelung mit Ueberlastschutz für ein Bohrgerät | [1987/42] | English: | Power control with overload protection for a drilling tool | [1987/42] | French: | Réglage du mouvement avec déclencheur à maxima d'intensité pour outillage de forage | [1987/42] | File destroyed: | 29.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 15.04.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/49] | 12.07.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2312127 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | DE2326045 [ ] (HEBERLEIN & CO AG); | DE1763279 [ ] |