EP0242331 - Azo dyes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.1993 [1993/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adam, Jean-Marie, Dr. Rue de Village Neuf 60 D F-68300 Rosenau / FR | [1987/43] | Application number, filing date | 87810227.6 | 09.04.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | CH19860001521 | 16.04.1986 Original published format: CH 152186 | [1987/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0242331 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0242331 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0242331 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C09B29/033, D06P1/39, C09D11/00 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
C09D11/17 (EP,US);
C09B29/0011 (EP,US);
C09D11/037 (EP,US);
D21H21/28 (EP,US);
Y10S534/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1987/43] | Title | German: | Azofarbstoffe | [1987/43] | English: | Azo dyes | [1987/43] | French: | Colorants azoiques | [1987/43] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/43] | 12.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 30.12.1992 | [1993/28] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB922839 (DU PONT); | [X]FR2139145 (BAYER AG); | [X]US4285861 (BRODE DAVID A, et al) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 83, 1975, Seite 173, Zusammenfassung Nr. 61597k, Columbus, Ohio, US; A.M. OSMAN et al.: "Heterocyclic compounds. V. Preparation of some new napththoxazole dyes and highly stable diazonium salts", & INDIAN J. CHEM. 1974, 12(1), 48-50 |