EP0243313 - Acyl-cyclohexane diones and their oxime ethers exhibiting a herbicidal and plant growth activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1991 [1991/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/44] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tobler, Hans, Dr. Baselmattweg 157 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | [1987/44] | Application number, filing date | 87810238.3 | 15.04.1987 | [1987/44] | Priority number, date | CH19860001664 | 24.04.1986 Original published format: CH 166486 | [1987/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0243313 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0243313 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C323/11, C07C317/06, C07C317/18, A01N35/06, A01N41/10 | [1990/20] | CPC: |
C07C323/22 (EP,US);
C07C317/26 (KR);
A01N35/06 (EP,US);
A01N35/10 (EP,US);
A01N41/10 (EP,US);
C07C317/24 (EP,US);
C07C317/30 (EP,US);
C07C323/47 (EP,US);
C07C325/00 (KR);
C07C2601/02 (EP,US);
C07C2601/04 (EP,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1987/44] | C07C149/26, C07C149/273, C07C147/00, A01N35/06, A01N41/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/44] | Title | German: | Acyl-cyclohexandione und deren Oximäther mit herbizider und das Pflanzenwachstum regulierender Wirkung | [1987/44] | English: | Acyl-cyclohexane diones and their oxime ethers exhibiting a herbicidal and plant growth activity | [1987/44] | French: | Acyl-cyclohexanediones et leurs éthers oximes doués d'une activité herbicide et d'une activité régulant la croissance des végétaux | [1987/44] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/44] | 30.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2822304 ; | [A]DE3123018 (NIPPON SODA CO [JP]); | [AD]EP0090262 (STAUFFER CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [A]EP0099534 (BASF AG [DE]) | [AD] - AGRICULTURAL AND BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, Band 37, Nr. 1, J{nner 1973, Agricultural Chemical Society of Japan, TAKAYUKI ORITANI et al.: "Syntheses of Pentadienoic Acids Structurally Related to Abscisic Acis", Seiten 261-268 |