Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0245203
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.11.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] |
11.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
28.02.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] |
19.05.1994 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.07.1994 [1994/27] |
25.02.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.1994 [1994/16] |
27.05.1993 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] |
01.11.1989 |
First examination report |
|
21.09.1988 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] |
03.03.1988 |
Publication of search report |
published on 20.04.1988 [1988/16] |
19.01.1988 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.03.1988 [1988/10] |
26.09.1987 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.11.1987 [1987/46] |