EP0245203 - Controllable clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pemberton, JC. 9920 Sunset Avenue La Mesa California 92041 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/46] | For all designated states Pemberton, JC. 9920 Sunset Avenue La Mesa California 92041 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
East, Gregory M. 10744, Rockvill Street Santee California 92071 / US | [1987/46] | Representative(s) | Tschudi, Lorenz, et al Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/46] | Tschudi, Lorenz, et al Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 CH-3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 87810271.4 | 29.04.1987 | [1987/46] | Priority number, date | US19860857218 | 30.04.1986 Original published format: US 857218 | [1987/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0245203 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0245203 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0245203 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16D15/00, F16D19/00, F16H3/74 | [1988/10] | CPC: |
F16D15/00 (EP);
F16D19/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/46] | F16D15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/46] | Title | German: | Steuerbare Kupplung | [1987/46] | English: | Controllable clutch | [1987/46] | French: | Embrayage réglable | [1987/46] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/45] | 03.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.06.1989 | 01.05.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.1990 | 02.05.1991 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   05.08.1991 | 01.05.1992 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 14.07.1993 | SE | 14.07.1993 | ES | 25.10.1993 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 14.07.1993 | |
SE | 14.07.1993 | ||
Former [1997/16] | SE | 14.07.1993 | |
Former [1994/16] | SE | 14.07.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR355194 (PAUL VALERY ROLIER [FR]); | [X]FR400290 (DAVID GEORGE [GB]); | [A]DE337484 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [A]GB278427 (GEORGE CONSTANTINESCO); | [Y]GB539223 (ALBERT EMILE MARCEL LEPETIT); | [X]GB818502 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN); | [X]DE1142083 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [Y]US3330171 (NASVYTIS ALGIRDAS L); | [Y]US3548673 (SUCHOCKI ANTHONY J); | [Y]CA950237 (GUILLEMETTE AURELE, et al) |