EP0263071 - 2-Substituted-e-fused-[1,2,4]-triazolo[1,5-c] pyrimidines, pharmaceutical compositions, and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Francis, John E. 15 Wexford Way Basking Ridge, N.J. 07920 / US | 02 /
Gelotte, Karl O. 106 Stanie Brae Drive Watchburg, N.J. 07060 / US | [1988/14] | Application number, filing date | 87810560.0 | 25.09.1987 | [1988/14] | Priority number, date | US19860913173 | 30.09.1986 Original published format: US 913173 | US19870020055 | 27.02.1987 Original published format: US 20055 | [1988/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0263071 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0263071 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D487/08, C07D471/14, C07D487/14, C07D495/14, C07D491/147, C07D498/14, C07H17/02, A61K31/495, A61K31/70, // (C07D487/04, 249:00, 239:00),(C07D487/08, 249:00, 239:00),(C07D487/14, 249:00, 239:00, 209:00),(C07D471/14, 249:00, 239:00, 221:00),(C07D487/14, 249:00, 239:00, 235:00),(C07D487/14), C07D249:00 | [1988/14] | CPC: |
C07D471/14 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07D487/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/14] | Title | German: | 2-Substituierte-e-kondensierte[1,2,4]Triazolo-[1,5-c]pyrimidine, pharmazeutische Zubereitungen und ihre Verwendung | [1988/14] | English: | 2-Substituted-e-fused-[1,2,4]-triazolo[1,5-c] pyrimidines, pharmaceutical compositions, and uses thereof | [1988/14] | French: | [1,2,4]Triazolo[1,5-c]pyrimidines condensées en e et substituées en 2, compositions pharmaceutiques et leur utilisation | [1988/14] | Examination procedure | 28.09.1987 | Examination requested [1988/14] | 07.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0181282 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [XP]EP0217748 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) | Examination | - Alfred Burger, Medicinal Chemistry, 3rd Edition, 1970, pages 74-77 |