blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0279145

EP0279145 - Scissors for cutting tubular webbings [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.1991
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.1997Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 23.04.1997 [1997/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
9494 Schaan / LI
[N/P]
Former [1988/34]For all designated states
HILTI Aktiengesellschaft
FL-9494 Schaan / LI
Inventor(s)01 / Leibhard, Erich
Bauweberstrasse 2
D-8000 München 71 / DE
[1988/34]
Representative(s)Wildi, Roland
Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung
9494 Schaan / LI
[N/P]
Former [1988/34]Wildi, Roland
Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung
FL-9494 Schaan / LI
Application number, filing date87810781.224.12.1987
[1988/34]
Priority number, dateCH1987000050311.02.1987         Original published format: CH 50387
[1988/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0279145
Date:24.08.1988
Language:DE
[1988/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0279145
Date:22.08.1990
Language:DE
[1990/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.1988
ClassificationIPC:B26B13/22, B25B7/22
[1988/34]
CPC:
B25B7/22 (EP); B25F1/003 (EP); B26B13/22 (EP);
F16B13/14 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1988/34]
TitleGerman:Schere zum Schneiden von Strangmaterial[1988/34]
English:Scissors for cutting tubular webbings[1988/34]
French:Ciseaux pour la coupe de tissu tubulaire[1988/34]
Examination procedure07.09.1988Examination requested  [1988/44]
31.07.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.11.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.02.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.1990Fee for grant paid
17.04.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.05.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2070217  (SEGER WILLIAM E);
 [A]US2722695  (KELLEY CHARLES K);
 [A]GB2144070  (NICHOLLS WESLEY DURHAM, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.