EP0239548 - Air diffuser for air-conditioning system for the compartments of railway carriage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAB WABCO S.p.A. Via Volvera, 51 10045 Piossasco (TO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | For all designated states SAB WABCO S.p.A. Via Volvera, 51 I-10045 Piossasco (TO) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mourglia, Marco Via R. Balmas 7 I-10060 Pomaretto (Torino) / IT | 02 /
Pero, Piergiorgio Piazza Centenario 17 I-10069 Villar Perosa Torino / IT | 03 /
Gaidano, Pietro Via Passo Buole 165 I-10135 Torino / IT | 04 /
Sciacca, Sarino Corso Correnti 37 I-10136 Torino / IT | [1987/40] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 87830112.6 | 23.03.1987 | [1987/40] | Priority number, date | IT19860067236 | 25.03.1986 Original published format: IT 6723686 | [1987/40] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0239548 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0239548 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B61D27/00, B60H1/00 | [1987/49] | CPC: |
B61D27/0018 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/40] | B61D27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/40] | Title | German: | Luftverteiler für die Klimaanlage von Schienenpersonenwagenabteilen | [1987/40] | English: | Air diffuser for air-conditioning system for the compartments of railway carriage | [1987/40] | French: | Diffuseur d'air pour système de climatisation de compartiments de voitures de véhicules ferroviaires | [1987/40] | File destroyed: | 29.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 17.06.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/05] | 13.09.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH429813 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]); | [Y]GB1181270 (FRIEDMANN KG ALEX [AT]); | [Y]DE1954300 (HAGENUK NEUFELDT KUHNKE GMBH); | [A]US3763761 (ANDERSON G, et al); | [A]FR2175453 (FRIEDMANN KG ALEX [AT]); | [A]FR2307687 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]); | [A]FR2461606 (AIR IND) |