EP0273873 - Broom or brush with hinged handle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/27] | Broom or brush with hinged hangle | ||
[1992/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.1993 [1993/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sartori, Francesco Via S. Felice n. 44 I-40122 Bologna / IT | [1988/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Pederzini, Paolo Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | Pederzini, Paolo c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via dei Mille, 19 I-40121 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 87830339.5 | 25.09.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | IT19860003525 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: IT 352586 | [1988/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0273873 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0273873 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0273873 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A46B5/00, B25G1/06 | [1988/27] | CPC: |
B25G3/38 (EP,US);
A46B5/0054 (EP,US);
A46B2200/302 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32557 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, NL [1988/27] | Title | German: | Besen oder Bürste mit einem gelenkigen Stiel | [1988/27] | English: | Broom or brush with hinged handle | [1992/27] | French: | Balai ou brosse à manche articulé | [1988/27] |
Former [1988/27] | Broom or brush with hinged hangle | Examination procedure | 18.10.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 17.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2802230 (MADDOX MARSHALL J); | [A]FR1419902 (SOPREMAC); | [A]FR2229511 (SABLE FRERES INT [FR]) |