EP0233165 - A method of packing yielding objects and a means for performing the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORABRO AB Box 179 S-713 00 Nora / SE | [1987/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sohlberg, Örjan Vargtorpsvägen 1F S-713 00 Nora / SE | 02 /
Broström, Ulf Fagersand S-713 00 Nora / SE | [1987/34] | Representative(s) | Lautmann, Kurt O KURT LAUTMANNS PATENTBYRA AB Box 245 691 25 Karlskoga / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | Lautmann, Kurt O. KURT LAUTMANNS PATENTBYRA AB Box 245 S-691 25 Karlskoga / SE | Application number, filing date | 87850034.7 | 02.02.1987 | [1987/34] | Priority number, date | SE19860000450 | 03.02.1986 Original published format: SE 8600450 | [1987/34] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0233165 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0233165 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65B25/16 | [1987/34] | CPC: |
B65B25/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verpacken von nachgiebigen Gegenständen und Mittel zur Ausführung des Verfahrens | [1987/34] | English: | A method of packing yielding objects and a means for performing the method | [1987/34] | French: | Procédé d'emballage d'objets élastiques et moyen pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé | [1987/34] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 01.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/05] | 16.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/48] | 21.06.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1990/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3645069 ; | [A]FR1511520 ; | [A]DE954139 ; | [A]GB2009702 |