EP0242342 - Fan [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAX Electro Products AB P.O. Box 72 S-642 00 Flen / SE | [1987/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mannerblad, John Adolf Prins Wilhelmsväg 41 S-642 00 Flen / SE | [1987/43] | Representative(s) | Klauber, Tomas Patentbyra Klauber & Sedvall AB P.O. Box 7182 103 88 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | Klauber, Tomas Patentbyra Klauber & Sedvall AB P.O. Box 7182 S-103 88 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 87850096.6 | 24.03.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | SE19860001748 | 17.04.1986 Original published format: SE 8601748 | [1987/43] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0242342 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/64, F04D25/12 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
F04D29/646 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/43] | Title | German: | Gebläse | [1987/43] | English: | Fan | [1987/43] | French: | Ventilateur | [1987/43] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 13.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/23] | 16.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4353680 ; | [A]GB201046 ; | [A]US1684144 |