EP0242344 - Method and apparatus for controlling a motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON Patent and Trademark Department 126 25 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON Patent and Trademark Department S-126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersson, Per Christer Eriksbergtorg 6A S-191 41 Sollentuna / SE | [1987/43] | Application number, filing date | 87850100.6 | 25.03.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | SE19860001802 | 18.04.1986 Original published format: SE 8601802 | [1987/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0242344 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0242344 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/02, H02P8/00 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
H02P8/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines Motors | [1987/43] | English: | Method and apparatus for controlling a motor | [1987/43] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la commande d'un moteur | [1987/43] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 18.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2022345 [ ] (HAWKER SIDDELEY DYNAMICS ENG); | US4563619 [ ] (DAVIS REX M [GB], et al) |