EP0257003 - An enzyme preparation capable of degrading glycosaminoglycan, and a method for producing said preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabi Pharmacia AB Rapsgatan 7 751 82 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | For all designated states Kabi Pharmacia AB Rapsgatan 7 S-751 82 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [1988/08] | For all designated states PHARMACIA AB Rapsgatan 7 S-751 82 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karlstam, Björn E.O. Spiltvägen 7 S-740 30 Björklinge / SE | [1988/08] | Application number, filing date | 87850203.8 | 22.06.1987 | [1988/08] | Priority number, date | SE19860003051 | 09.07.1986 Original published format: SE 8603051 | [1988/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0257003 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0257003 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0257003 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/26, // A61K37/54 | [1988/08] | CPC: |
C12N9/2408 (EP,US);
Y10S435/947 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/08] | Title | German: | Zum Abbau von Glycosaminoglycan fähige Enzymzusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Herstellung dieser Zusammensetzung | [1988/08] | English: | An enzyme preparation capable of degrading glycosaminoglycan, and a method for producing said preparation | [1988/08] | French: | Composition d'enzyme capable de dégrader le glycosaminoglycane, et méthode de production de cette composition | [1988/08] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 26.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.10.1993 | BE | 13.10.1993 | CH | 13.10.1993 | DE | 13.10.1993 | FR | 13.10.1993 | GR | 13.10.1993 | IT | 13.10.1993 | LI | 13.10.1993 | NL | 13.10.1993 | SE | 13.10.1993 | ES | 24.01.1994 | LU | 30.06.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/03] | AT | 13.10.1993 | |
BE | 13.10.1993 | ||
CH | 13.10.1993 | ||
DE | 13.10.1993 | ||
GR | 13.10.1993 | ||
IT | 13.10.1993 | ||
LI | 13.10.1993 | ||
NL | 13.10.1993 | ||
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
ES | 24.01.1994 | ||
FR | 04.03.1994 | ||
LU | 30.06.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 13.10.1993 | |
BE | 13.10.1993 | ||
CH | 13.10.1993 | ||
DE | 13.10.1993 | ||
GR | 13.10.1993 | ||
IT | 13.10.1993 | ||
LI | 13.10.1993 | ||
NL | 13.10.1993 | ||
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
FR | 04.03.1994 | ||
LU | 30.06.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 13.10.1993 | |
BE | 13.10.1993 | ||
CH | 13.10.1993 | ||
DE | 13.10.1993 | ||
IT | 13.10.1993 | ||
LI | 13.10.1993 | ||
NL | 13.10.1993 | ||
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
FR | 04.03.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | AT | 13.10.1993 | |
BE | 13.10.1993 | ||
CH | 13.10.1993 | ||
DE | 13.10.1993 | ||
LI | 13.10.1993 | ||
NL | 13.10.1993 | ||
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
FR | 04.03.1994 | ||
Former [1994/39] | AT | 13.10.1993 | |
BE | 13.10.1993 | ||
CH | 13.10.1993 | ||
DE | 13.10.1993 | ||
LI | 13.10.1993 | ||
NL | 13.10.1993 | ||
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/38] | AT | 13.10.1993 | |
BE | 13.10.1993 | ||
CH | 13.10.1993 | ||
DE | 13.10.1993 | ||
LI | 13.10.1993 | ||
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 13.10.1993 | |
CH | 13.10.1993 | ||
DE | 13.10.1993 | ||
LI | 13.10.1993 | ||
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 13.10.1993 | |
CH | 13.10.1993 | ||
LI | 13.10.1993 | ||
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/27] | CH | 13.10.1993 | |
LI | 13.10.1993 | ||
SE | 13.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | CH | 13.10.1993 | |
LI | 13.10.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0005751 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]); | [X]WO8504809 (HELLGREN LARS G I, et al) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 75, no. 15, 11th October 1971, page 24, no. 94795m, Columbus, Ohio, US; H. YAMAMOTO et al.: "Purification of fish gastric hyaluronidase" & NIPPON SUISAN GAKKAISHI 1971, 37(7), 621-5 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 13, 28th March 1983, page 378, no. 104593k, Columbus, Ohio, US; N. ROSOIU et al.: "Antihvaluronidases from marine organisms" & REV. ROUM. BIOCHIM. 1982, 19(3), 229-34 |