EP0263090 - The treatment of mercury contaminated lakes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1992 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boliden Mineral AB 932 00 Skelleftehamn / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | For all designated states Boliden Mineral AB S-932 00 Skelleftehamn / SE | ||
Former [1988/14] | For all designated states Boliden Aktiebolag Box 81550 S-104 82 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paulsson, Karin Marianne Hammargatan 6 S-932 00 Skelleftehamn / SE | 02 /
Björnberg, Arne Vallarevägen 14 S-183 51 Täby / SE | [1988/14] | Representative(s) | Lundin, Björn-Eric Trelleborg AB Patents and Trade Marks Box 21024 100 31 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | Lundin, Björn-Eric Trelleborg AB Patents and Trade Marks Box 21024 S-100 31 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 87850295.4 | 01.10.1987 | [1988/14] | Priority number, date | SE19860004211 | 03.10.1986 Original published format: SE 8604211 | [1988/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0263090 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0263090 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/68, A01K63/04 | [1988/14] | CPC: |
C02F1/5236 (EP,US);
C02F1/62 (KR);
A01K63/04 (EP,US);
C02F1/683 (EP,US);
C02F2101/20 (EP,US);
C02F2103/007 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/14] | Title | German: | Behandlung von mit Quecksilber verunreinigten Seen | [1988/14] | English: | The treatment of mercury contaminated lakes | [1988/14] | French: | Traitement des lacs pollués par le mercure | [1988/14] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/47] | 02.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2080666 [ ] (MCKECHNIE CHEM LTD) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 99(1983), Abstract No. 134 934 K, Can. Tech. Rep. Fish. Aquat. Sci. 1983, 1151, 45-67 (Eng.) | [ ] - Arch. Environ. Contam. Toxicol. Vol. 12 No. 4, 1983, p 405-413, J F KLAVERKAMP et al.: "Selenite Toxicity and Mercury-Selenium Interactions in Juvenile Fish" *page 405, Abstract* |