EP0266335 - Container for storing liquids under pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1992 [1992/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE D'ENTREPRISES CFE, S.A. Chaussée de la Hulpe, 164 B-1170 Bruxelles / BE | For all designated states FORAKY S.A. Place des Barricades 13 B-1000 Bruxelles / BE | [1988/21] |
Former [1988/18] | For all designated states Compagnie François d'Entreprises CFE S.A. Chaussée de la Hulpe, 164 B-1170 Bruxelles / BE | ||
For all designated states FORAKY S.A. Place des Barricades 13 B-1000 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duvieusart, Jean-Claude Rue du Coq, 14 B-1328 Lasne / BE | 02 /
Le Begge, Maximilien Rue Marcelis, 21 B-1970 Wezembeek / BE | [1988/18] | Representative(s) | Plucker, Guy, et al Office Kirkpatrick S.A. Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/18] | Plucker, Guy, et al OFFICE KIRKPATRICK Avenue Wolfers, 32 B-1310 La Hulpe / BE | Application number, filing date | 87870154.9 | 30.10.1987 | [1988/18] | Priority number, date | FR19860015162 | 30.10.1986 Original published format: FR 8615162 | [1988/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0266335 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0266335 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E04H7/18 | [1988/18] | CPC: |
E04H7/18 (EP,US);
F17C3/022 (EP,US);
F17C2201/0119 (EP,US);
F17C2201/032 (EP,US);
F17C2201/052 (EP,US);
F17C2203/013 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0604 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0619 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0639 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0678 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0695 (EP,US);
F17C2221/035 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0153 (EP,US);
F17C2223/033 (EP,US);
F17C2260/042 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0147 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/18] | Title | German: | Lagerbehälter für unter Druck stehende Flüssigkeiten | [1988/18] | English: | Container for storing liquids under pressure | [1988/18] | French: | Réservoir de stockage de fluide sous pression | [1988/18] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/18] | 13.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 12.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2016442 ; | [A]EP0060169 (TECHNIGAZ [FR]); | [A]EP0069051 (HOLZMANN PHILIPP AG [DE]) |